MI SB0954 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Traffic control; driver license; address confidentiality program for certain victims and individuals; allow for driver license to be issued with designated address. Amends secs. 40b, 310 & 314 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.40b et seq.) & adds sec. 310f. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0655'17

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic control; driver license; address confidentiality program for certain victims and individuals; allow for driver license to be issued with designated address. Amends secs. 40b, 310 & 314 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.40b et seq.) & adds sec. 310f. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0655'17

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 290 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2018-05-15HouseRead A First Time
2018-05-15HouseReceived On 05/15/2018
2018-05-15SenatePassed Roll Call # 290 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-05-10SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2018-05-10SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-05-10SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-04-26SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2018-04-26SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-04-26SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-04-19SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2018-04-19SenateIntroduced By Senator Rick Jones

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback