MI SB0944 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-14 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-14 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: House Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Businesses: nonprofit corporations; conditions for the sale, lease, or other transfer of a hospital owned by a hospital board; modify. Amends sec. 9 of 1945 PA 47 (MCL 331.9).
Title
Businesses: nonprofit corporations; conditions for the sale, lease, or other transfer of a hospital owned by a hospital board; modify. Amends sec. 9 of 1945 PA 47 (MCL 331.9).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 113 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2022-04-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-04-14 | House | Received On 04/14/2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 113 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Roger Victory |