MI SB0938 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-28 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-28 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Administrative procedure: rules; annual review of rules, regulations, and licensing requirements imposed on businesses; require. Amends secs. 8 & 31 of 1969 PA 306 (MCL 24.208 & 24.231) & adds sec. 47a.
Title
Administrative procedure: rules; annual review of rules, regulations, and licensing requirements imposed on businesses; require. Amends secs. 8 & 31 of 1969 PA 306 (MCL 24.208 & 24.231) & adds sec. 47a.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Barrett [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 462 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-09-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2022-09-28 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-09-28 | House | Received On 09/28/2022 |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 462 Yeas 22 Nays 13 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-09-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-09-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Tom Barrett |