MI SB0929 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-26 - Ordered Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on September 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-26 - Ordered Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State management: funds; distributions from the health and safety fund; modify. Amends sec. 5 of 1987 PA 264 (MCL 141.475).
Title
State management: funds; distributions from the health and safety fund; modify. Amends sec. 5 of 1987 PA 264 (MCL 141.475).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 365 (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-09-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 305 (Y: 56 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-09-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 261 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-09-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 305 (Y: 56 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-09-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 261 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2024-09-26 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2024-09-26 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 365 Yeas 20 Nays 17 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2024-09-26 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In |
2024-09-25 | House | Returned To Senate |
2024-09-25 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2024-09-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 305 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2024-09-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-09-25 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2024-09-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-09-25 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2024-09-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-09-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-09-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2024-06-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2024-06-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-06-20 | House | Received On 06/20/2024 |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 261 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Sarah Anthony |
2024-09-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |