MI SB0911 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 0388'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-27 - Assigned Pa 0388'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; registration; optional registration taxes for regional transit authority; allow. Amends sec. 801 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.801) & adds sec. 801j. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0909'12
Title
Vehicles; registration; optional registration taxes for regional transit authority; allow. Amends sec. 801 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.801) & adds sec. 801j. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0909'12
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 702 (Y: 57 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 747 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 747 (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-27 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0388'12 |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/19/2012 @ 5:32 Pm |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/19/2012 @ 12:32 Pm |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/19/2012 @ 11:58 Am |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2012-12-11 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-06 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-06 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-06 | House | Passed Roll Call # 702 Yeas 57 Nays 50 |
2012-12-06 | House | Postponed Temporarily |
2012-12-06 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-06 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-11-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2012-11-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-27 | House | Received On 11/27/2012 |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 747 Yeas 22 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 As Amended |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Substitute S-2 As Amended Concurred In |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 And Amendment(s) |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2012-01-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB5311 (Same As) 2012-01-31 - Printed Bill Filed 01/27/2012