MI SB0894 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Assigned Pa 0366'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Land use; zoning and growth management; regulation of wireless communications infrastructure; make subject to wireless communications infrastructure deployment act. Amends sec. 205 of 2006 PA 110 (MCL 125.3205) & adds sec. 515.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land use; zoning and growth management; regulation of wireless communications infrastructure; make subject to wireless communications infrastructure deployment act. Amends sec. 205 of 2006 PA 110 (MCL 125.3205) & adds sec. 515.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-28 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 648 (Y: 77 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 162 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-13SenateAssigned Pa 0366'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-12-13SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 12/12/2018 @ 4:36 Pm
2018-12-13SenateApproved By Governor 12/12/2018 @ 12:08 Pm
2018-12-06SenatePresented To Governor 12/5/2018 @ 9:46 Am
2018-11-29SenateOrdered Enrolled
2018-11-29SenateFull Title Agreed To
2018-11-29SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2018-11-28HouseReturned To Senate
2018-11-28HouseInserted Full Title
2018-11-28HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 648 Yeas 77 Nays 32
2018-11-28HouseRead A Third Time
2018-11-28HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-11-28HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-11-28HouseRead A Second Time
2018-10-04HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-10-04HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2018-03-15HouseReferred To Committee On Energy Policy
2018-03-15HouseRead A First Time
2018-03-15HouseReceived On 03/15/2018
2018-03-15SenatePassed Roll Call # 162 Yeas 34 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-03-14SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2018-03-14SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-03-14SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-03-13SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-03-13SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-03-13SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2018-03-07SenateReferred To Committee On Energy And Technology
2018-03-07SenateIntroduced By Senator Michael Nofs

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2018-SB-0894
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2018-SIB-0894.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2018-SEBS-0894.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2018-SEBH-0894.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2018-SNB-0894.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0366.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-03-13-027.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-03-15-029.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-10-04-068.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-11-28-073.htm

Bill Comments

feedback