MI SB0881 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Assigned Pa 164'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Environmental protection; water pollution; exemptions for tailings disposal facilities; modify. Amends sec. 3116 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.3116).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental protection; water pollution; exemptions for tailings disposal facilities; modify. Amends sec. 3116 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.3116).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-15 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 286 (Y: 63 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 177 (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29SenateAssigned Pa 164'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-05-29SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 5/23/2018 @ 2:46 Pm
2018-05-29SenateApproved By Governor 5/23/2018 @ 1:15 Pm
2018-05-22SenatePresented To Governor 5/21/2018 @ 2:47 Pm
2018-05-16SenateOrdered Enrolled
2018-05-16SenateFull Title Agreed To
2018-05-16SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2018-05-15HouseReturned To Senate
2018-05-15HouseInserted Full Title
2018-05-15HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 286 Yeas 63 Nays 45
2018-05-15HouseRead A Third Time
2018-05-10HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-05-10HouseRead A Second Time
2018-05-02HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-05-02HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2018-03-22HouseReferred To Committee On Natural Resources
2018-03-22HouseRead A First Time
2018-03-22HouseReceived On 03/22/2018
2018-03-22SenatePassed Roll Call # 177 Yeas 23 Nays 11 Excused 3 Not Voting 0
2018-03-21SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2018-03-21SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-03-21SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-03-08SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2018-03-08SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-03-08SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-02-28SenateReferred To Committee On Natural Resources
2018-02-28SenateIntroduced By Senator Thomas Casperson

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2018-SB-0881
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2018-SIB-0881.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2018-SEBS-0881.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2018-SEBH-0881.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2018-SNB-0881.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0164.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-03-08-026.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-03-22-032.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-02-043.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-15-048.htm

Bill Comments

feedback