MI SB0880 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-29 - Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-29 - Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; penalty for not reporting child abuse; increase.
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; penalty for not reporting child abuse; increase.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 413 (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 157 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 157 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-05-24 | House | Returned To Senate |
2018-05-24 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 413 Yeas 108 Nays 1 |
2018-05-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-24 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-05-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2018-03-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-03-15 | House | Received On 03/15/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 157 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |