MI SB0878 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0599'12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Corrections; other; use of a certain youth correctional facility to house certain adult inmates; provide for, and allow department of corrections to contract with certain other vendors for placement of prisoners. Amends secs. 20i, 29, 63, 63a, 65, 65a, 69a & 70 of 1953 PA 232 (MCL 791.220i et seq.) & adds sec. 20j. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5174'11

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corrections; other; use of a certain youth correctional facility to house certain adult inmates; provide for, and allow department of corrections to contract with certain other vendors for placement of prisoners. Amends secs. 20i, 29, 63, 63a, 65, 65a, 69a & 70 of 1953 PA 232 (MCL 791.220i et seq.) & adds sec. 20j. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5174'11

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 1092 (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 896 (Y: 56 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 116 (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-31SenateAssigned Pa 0599'12
2012-12-31SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 1/9/2013 @ 3:24 Pm
2012-12-31SenateApproved By Governor 1/8/2013 @ 8:06 Pm
2012-12-31SenatePresented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 3:22 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-14SenateOrdered Enrolled
2012-12-14SenateTitle Amendment Agreed To
2012-12-14SenateImmediate Effect Defeated
2012-12-14Senate Roll Call # 1092 Yeas 21 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2012-12-14SenateHouse Substitute H-3 Concurred In
2012-12-14SenateHouse Amended Title
2012-12-14HouseReturned To Senate
2012-12-14HouseTitle Amended
2012-12-14HousePassed Roll Call # 896 Yeas 56 Nays 50
2012-12-14HouseAmended
2012-12-14HousePostponed Temporarily
2012-12-14HouseRead A Third Time
2012-12-14HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2012-12-14HousePlaced On Third Reading
2012-12-14HouseSubstitute H-3 Adopted And Amended
2012-12-14HouseRead A Second Time
2012-12-12HouseReferred To Second Reading
2012-12-12HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3
2012-03-08HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2012-03-08HouseRead A First Time
2012-03-08HouseReceived On 03/07/2012
2012-03-07SenatePassed Roll Call # 116 Yeas 21 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2012-03-06SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2
2012-03-06SenateSubstitute S-2 Concurred In
2012-03-06SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2
2012-02-28SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2012-02-28SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2012-02-28SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2011-12-13SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

HB5177 (Same As) 2012-02-16 - Placed On Third Reading

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2011-SB-0878
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2011-SIB-0878.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2011-SEBS-0878.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2011-SEBH-0878.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2011-SNB-0878.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/publicact/htm/2012-PA-0599.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-02-28-019.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-03-07-023.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-12-081.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-14-083.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-12-14-081.htm

Bill Comments

feedback