MI SB0845 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-20 - Postponed For The Day
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-20 - Postponed For The Day
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations: omnibus; appropriations in the school aid act for fiscal year 2022-2023; provide for. Amends, adds & repeals (See bill).
Title
Appropriations: omnibus; appropriations in the school aid act for fiscal year 2022-2023; provide for. Amends, adds & repeals (See bill).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-07-01 - House - House Third Reading: Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 370 (Y: 99 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Senate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 400 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Defeated Roll Call # 267 (Y: 0 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-05-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 233 (Y: 58 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 224 (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Senate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 400 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Defeated Roll Call # 267 (Y: 0 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-05-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 233 (Y: 58 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 224 (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-20 | Senate | Postponed For The Day |
2022-07-20 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0144'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-07-20 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/14/2022 02:32 Pm |
2022-07-20 | Senate | Approved By Governor With Line Item(s) Vetoed 07/14/2022 10:57 Am |
2022-07-20 | Senate | Presented To Governor 07/11/2022 01:36 Pm |
2022-07-20 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-07-01 | House | Returned To Senate |
2022-07-01 | House | Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 370 Yeas 99 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2022-07-01 | House | Conference Report Received |
2022-07-01 | Senate | Senate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 400 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2022-07-01 | Senate | Conference Report Received In Senate |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Referred To Conference Committee |
2022-06-21 | House | House Conferees Named 06/21/2022: Reps. Thomas A. Albert Brad Paquette Joe Tate |
2022-11-10 | House | Re-received From Senate With Notice Of Nonconcurrence In House Substitute (h-1) |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate Named Conferees 05/24/2022: Sens. Jim Stamas, Wayne A Schmidt, Curtis Hertel |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Defeated Roll Call # 267 Yeas 0 Nays 36 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2022-05-19 | Senate | House Substitute (h-1) Nonconcurred In |
2022-05-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2022-05-18 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2022-05-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 233 Yeas 58 Nays 48 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2022-05-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-05-18 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-05-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-05-18 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2022-05-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-05-17 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2022-05-17 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-05-17 | House | Rule Suspended |
2022-05-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2022-05-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-05-11 | House | Received On 05/11/2022 |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 224 Yeas 21 Nays 12 Excused 5 Not Voting 0 |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne A. Schmidt |
Subjects
Appropriations: community colleges
Appropriations: higher education
Appropriations: omnibus
Appropriations: school aid
Appropriations: supplemental
School aid: fiscal year appropriations
Appropriations: higher education
Appropriations: omnibus
Appropriations: school aid
Appropriations: supplemental
School aid: fiscal year appropriations