MI SB0843 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0320'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0320'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health: other; immunity from liability for certain school employees who administer an epinephrine auto-injector; modify. Amends sec. 1178 PA 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1178).
Title
Health: other; immunity from liability for certain school employees who administer an epinephrine auto-injector; modify. Amends sec. 1178 PA 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1178).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 580 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 156 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 156 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0320'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/29/2020 02:52 Pm |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/29/2020 11:04 Am |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/21/2020 12:36 Pm |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-12-17 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-12-17 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 580 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-12-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-12-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-12-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-06-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2020-06-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-06-02 | House | Received On 06/02/2020 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 156 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Peter J. Lucido |