MI SB0819 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
School aid; membership; per-pupil allocation for community districts; provide for. Amends secs. 3, 6, 20 & 31a of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1603 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0710'16
Title
School aid; membership; per-pupil allocation for community districts; provide for. Amends secs. 3, 6, 20 & 31a of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1603 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0710'16
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 126 (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2016-03-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-03-22 | House | Received On 03/22/2016 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senator Removed As Sponsor: Goeff Hansen |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 126 Yeas 21 Nays 16 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Goeff Hansen |
Subjects
Education: financing
Education: school districts
School aid: foundation allowance
School aid: membership
Education: school districts
School aid: foundation allowance
School aid: membership