MI SB0811 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0551'12 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0551'12 2012 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Villages; general law; references to September primary election; remove. Amends secs. 4 & 5, ch. II & sec. 3, ch. V of 1895 PA 3 (MCL 62.4 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0810'11
Title
Villages; general law; references to September primary election; remove. Amends secs. 4 & 5, ch. II & sec. 3, ch. V of 1895 PA 3 (MCL 62.4 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0810'11
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 885 (Y: 99 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 796 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 796 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0551'12 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/2/2013 @ 4:56 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/2/2013 @ 3:57 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 3:18 Pm 2012 Addenda |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-12-14 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2012-12-14 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-14 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-12-14 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-12-14 | House | Passed Roll Call # 885 Yeas 99 Nays 8 |
2012-12-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-14 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2012-12-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-12-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-12-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2012-11-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Redistricting And Elections |
2012-11-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-11-29 | House | Received On 11/29/2012 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 796 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-11-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Elections |