MI SB0796 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Aeronautics: other; regulation of air mobility; establish. Amends 1945 PA 327 (MCL 259.1 - 259.208) by adding sec. 206a.
Title
Aeronautics: other; regulation of air mobility; establish. Amends 1945 PA 327 (MCL 259.1 - 259.208) by adding sec. 206a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 96 (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2022-03-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-03-17 | House | Received On 03/17/2022 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 96 Yeas 32 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Aric Nesbitt |