MI SB0795 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Aeronautics: unmanned aircraft systems; advanced air mobility (AAM) task force; establish. Amends 1945 PA 327 (MCL 259.1 - 259.208) by adding sec. 207.
Title
Aeronautics: unmanned aircraft systems; advanced air mobility (AAM) task force; establish. Amends 1945 PA 327 (MCL 259.1 - 259.208) by adding sec. 207.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 95 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2022-03-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-03-17 | House | Received On 03/17/2022 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 95 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Curtis Hertel, Jr. |