MI SB0788 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on November 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-11-13 - Assigned Pa 0150'24
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Vehicles: registration plates; special registration plates for women veterans; provide for. Amends 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.1 - 257.923) by adding sec. 803u.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: registration plates; special registration plates for women veterans; provide for. Amends 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.1 - 257.923) by adding sec. 803u.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-11-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 328 (Y: 59 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 239 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-11-13SenateAssigned Pa 0150'24
2024-11-13SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 11/08/2024 04:54 Pm
2024-11-13SenateApproved By Governor 11/08/2024 03:54 Pm
2024-11-12SenatePresented To Governor 11/08/2024 09:32 Am
2024-11-07SenateTitle Amendment Agreed To
2024-11-07SenateRoll Call: Roll Call # 414 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0
2024-11-07SenateHouse Substitute (h-2) Concurred In
2024-11-07HouseReturned To Senate
2024-11-07HouseTitle Amended
2024-11-07HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 328 Yeas 59 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2024-11-07HouseRead A Third Time
2024-11-07HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2024-11-07HousePlaced On Third Reading
2024-11-07HouseSubstitute (h-2) Adopted
2024-11-07HouseRead A Second Time
2024-11-07HousePlaced On Second Reading
2024-11-07HouseMotion To Discharge Committee Approved
2024-11-07HouseRule Suspended
2024-06-11HouseReferred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure
2024-06-11HouseRead A First Time
2024-06-11HouseReceived On 06/11/2024
2024-06-11SenatePassed Roll Call # 239 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2024-06-05SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2024-06-05SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2024-06-05SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2024-05-22SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2024-05-22SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2024-03-13SenateReferred To Committee On Veterans And Emergency Services
2024-03-13SenateIntroduced By Senator Sylvia Santana

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.mi.gov/Bills/Bill?ObjectName=2024-SB-0788
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2024-SIB-0788.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2024-SEBS-0788.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2024-SEBH-0788.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2024-SNB-0788.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/publicact/htm/2024-PA-0150.htm
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0788-G.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0788-F.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0788-B.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-0788-U.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0788-3E34620A.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0788-54BD74CA.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2024-SJ-06-11-057.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2024-SJ-05-23-050.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2024-HJ-11-07-075.htm

Bill Comments

feedback