MI SB0788 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
Pending: House Elections And Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
Pending: House Elections And Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Campaign finance: contributions and expenditures; funds donated to a candidate for recall efforts; require candidate to establish a separate account used for recall purposes. Amends secs. 3, 11, 12, 21 & 24 of 1976 PA 388 (MCL 169.203 et seq.) & adds sec. 21b.
Title
Campaign finance: contributions and expenditures; funds donated to a candidate for recall efforts; require candidate to establish a separate account used for recall purposes. Amends secs. 3, 11, 12, 21 & 24 of 1976 PA 388 (MCL 169.203 et seq.) & adds sec. 21b.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 135 (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2022-04-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-04-26 | House | Received On 04/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 135 Yeas 21 Nays 15 Excused 1 Not Voting 1 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-4) |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Substitute (s-4) Concurred In |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-4) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Runestad |