MI SB0784 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-12 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health; emergency response; do-not-resuscitate order; allow a parent or guardian to execute on behalf of a minor child. Amends secs. 2, 3a, 4, 8, 10, 11 & 13 of 1996 PA 193 (MCL 333.1052 et seq.) & adds sec. 3b.
Title
Health; emergency response; do-not-resuscitate order; allow a parent or guardian to execute on behalf of a minor child. Amends secs. 2, 3a, 4, 8, 10, 11 & 13 of 1996 PA 193 (MCL 333.1052 et seq.) & adds sec. 3b.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 507 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-12 | House | Received On 06/12/2018 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 507 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Adopted |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rebekah Warren |
Subjects
Education: employees
Education: school districts
Education: students
Health: emergency response
Health: emergency services
Health: patient directives
Education: school districts
Education: students
Health: emergency response
Health: emergency services
Health: patient directives