MI SB0783 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0268'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0268'12 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Torts; nonmedical malpractice; certified public accountants; modify protection from liability to nonclients. Amends sec. 2962 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2962).
Title
Torts; nonmedical malpractice; certified public accountants; modify protection from liability to nonclients. Amends sec. 2962 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2962).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 555 (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 458 (Y: 86 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 135 (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 458 (Y: 86 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 135 (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0268'12 With Immediate Effect |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/3/2012 @ 10:10 Am |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/25/2012 @ 4:18 Pm |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/21/2012 @ 11:08 Am |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Roll Call # 555 Yeas 31 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-06-14 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2012-06-14 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2012-06-14 | House | Returned To Senate |
2012-06-14 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2012-06-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 458 Yeas 86 Nays 24 |
2012-06-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-06-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-06-13 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-06-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-06-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-06-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-03-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Banking And Financial Services |
2012-03-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-03-15 | House | Received On 03/14/2012 |
2012-03-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 135 Yeas 31 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2012-03-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |