MI SB0779 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Trade: containers; reimbursement for overredemption of beverage containers; modify process. Amends secs. 3a, 3b & 3c of 1976 IL 1 (MCL 445.573a et seq.).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trade: containers; reimbursement for overredemption of beverage containers; modify process. Amends secs. 3a, 3b & 3c of 1976 IL 1 (MCL 445.573a et seq.).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed By 3/4 Vote Roll Call # 224 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-22HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means
2020-06-23HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2020-06-23HouseRead A First Time
2020-06-23HouseReceived On 06/23/2020
2020-06-23SenatePassed By 3/4 Vote Roll Call # 224 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-06-18SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2)
2020-06-18SenateSubstitute (s-2) Concurred In
2020-06-18SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2020-06-16SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2)
2020-06-16SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-06-16SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2020-02-05SenateReferred To Committee On Natural Resources
2020-02-05SenateIntroduced By Senator Ed Mcbroom

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback