MI SB0757 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-25 - Assigned Pa 331'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Occupations; alarm systems; low-voltage alarm system installation permitting; provide for. Amends sec. 733 of 2016 PA 407 (MCL 339.5733).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupations; alarm systems; low-voltage alarm system installation permitting; provide for. Amends sec. 733 of 2016 PA 407 (MCL 339.5733).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 493 (Y: 101 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 193 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-25SenateAssigned Pa 331'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-07-25SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 7/2/2018 @ 1:12 Pm
2018-07-25SenateApproved By Governor 6/28/2018 @ 6:38 Am
2018-07-25SenatePresented To Governor 6/20/2018 @ 3:10 Pm
2018-06-12SenateOrdered Enrolled
2018-06-12SenateFull Title Agreed To
2018-06-12SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2018-06-12HouseReturned To Senate
2018-06-12HouseInserted Full Title
2018-06-12HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 493 Yeas 101 Nays 8
2018-06-12HouseRead A Third Time
2018-06-07HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-06-07HouseRead A Second Time
2018-05-29HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-05-29HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2018-04-17HousePer Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Communications And Technology
2018-04-12HouseReferred To Committee On Energy Policy
2018-04-12HouseRead A First Time
2018-04-12HouseReceived On 04/12/2018
2018-04-12SenatePassed Roll Call # 193 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2018-04-11SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2018-04-11SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-04-11SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-04-10SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2018-04-10SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-04-10SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-01-18SenateReferred To Committee On Energy And Technology
2018-01-18SenateIntroduced By Senator Marty Knollenberg

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2018-SB-0757
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2018-SIB-0757.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2018-SEBS-0757.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2018-SEBH-0757.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2018-SNB-0757.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0331.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-04-10-033.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-04-12-035.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-29-054.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-06-12-059.htm

Bill Comments

feedback