MI SB0756 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-24 - Re-referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-24 - Re-referred To Committee On Ways And Means
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Elections: election officials; election inspectors working in shifts on an absent voter counting board after the polls close on election day; allow. Amends sec. 765a of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.765a).
Title
Elections: election officials; election inspectors working in shifts on an absent voter counting board after the polls close on election day; allow. Amends sec. 765a of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.765a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 160 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 159 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 160 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 159 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-09-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-09-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2020-06-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-06-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-06-04 | House | Received On 06/04/2020 |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 160 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 159 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ruth A. Johnson |