MI SB0752 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-17 - Notice Given To Discharge Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-17 - Notice Given To Discharge Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax; property tax credit; total household resources disqualifier and phase-out; increase and revise. Amends sec. 520 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.520).
Title
Individual income tax; property tax credit; total household resources disqualifier and phase-out; increase and revise. Amends sec. 520 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.520).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 416 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | House | Notice Given To Discharge Committee |
2014-12-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2014-12-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-12-16 | House | Received On 12/12/2014 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 416 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Introduced By Senator David Hildenbrand |