MI SB0749 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Re-referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Re-referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax; credit; child care credit; create. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.713) by adding sec. 272a.
Title
Individual income tax; credit; child care credit; create. Amends 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.1 - 206.713) by adding sec. 272a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 19 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 19 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2018-01-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 19 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-01-24 | House | Received On 01/23/2018 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Margaret O'brien |