MI SB0742 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Trade: containers; telephone and electronic mechanisms for reporting violations of the bottle bill; establish. Amends 1976 IL 1 (MCL 445.571 - 445.576) by adding secs. 4c & 4d.
Title
Trade: containers; telephone and electronic mechanisms for reporting violations of the bottle bill; establish. Amends 1976 IL 1 (MCL 445.571 - 445.576) by adding secs. 4c & 4d.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Moss [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed By 3/4 Vote Roll Call # 87 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2022-03-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-03-17 | House | Received On 03/17/2022 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Passed By 3/4 Vote Roll Call # 87 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jeremy Moss |
Subjects
Environmental protection: recycling and waste utilization
State agencies (existing): attorney general
Trade: containers
State agencies (existing): attorney general
Trade: containers