MI SB0740 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-04 - Referred To Committee On Commerce
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-04 - Referred To Committee On Commerce
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; corridor improvement; board membership; modify. Amends sec. 8 of 2005 PA 280 (MCL 125.2878).
Title
Economic development; corridor improvement; board membership; modify. Amends sec. 8 of 2005 PA 280 (MCL 125.2878).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 366 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2014-06-04 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-06-04 | House | Received On 06/04/2014 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 366 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Virgil Smith |