MI SB0737 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Assigned Pa 197'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Property; recording; recording with register of deeds; require an English translation document to be included. Amends sec. 1 of 1937 PA 103 (MCL 565.201).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property; recording; recording with register of deeds; require an English translation document to be included. Amends sec. 1 of 1937 PA 103 (MCL 565.201).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 359 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 356 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 76 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-05SenateAssigned Pa 197'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-09-05SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 6/20/2018 @ 1:24 Pm
2018-09-05SenateApproved By Governor 6/19/2018 @ 8:12 Pm
2018-06-12SenatePresented To Governor 6/8/2018 @ 9:57 Am
2018-05-29SenateOrdered Enrolled
2018-05-29SenateTitle Amendment Agreed To
2018-05-29SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2018-05-29Senate Roll Call # 359 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-05-29SenateHouse Substitute H-1 Concurred In
2018-05-22HouseReturned To Senate
2018-05-22HouseTitle Amended
2018-05-22HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 356 Yeas 106 Nays 2
2018-05-22HouseRead A Third Time
2018-05-17HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-05-17HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2018-05-17HouseRead A Second Time
2018-05-02HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-05-02HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2018-02-14HouseReferred To Committee On Local Government
2018-02-14HouseRead A First Time
2018-02-14HouseReceived On 02/14/2018
2018-02-14SenatePassed Roll Call # 76 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2018-02-13SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2018-02-13SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2018-01-31SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2018-01-31SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-01-31SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2017-12-13SenateReferred To Committee On Local Government
2017-12-13SenateIntroduced By Senator Curtis Hertel

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-SB-0737
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2017-SIB-0737.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBS-0737.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBH-0737.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2017-SNB-0737.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0197.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-01-31-010.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-02-14-016.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-02-043.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-22-051.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-05-29-054.htm

Bill Comments

feedback