MI SB0731 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor: other; payment of administrative fee to wholesaler for a payment dishonored by a financial institution; require. Amends sec. 903b of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1903b).
Title
Liquor: other; payment of administrative fee to wholesaler for a payment dishonored by a financial institution; require. Amends sec. 903b of 1998 PA 58 (MCL 436.1903b).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 286 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2024-06-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-06-26 | House | Received On 06/26/2024 |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 286 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Affairs |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Roger Hauck |