MI SB0730 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0516'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 0516'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Food; service establishments; food allergies; require training and distribution of certain information. Amends sec. 2129 of 2000 PA 92 (MCL 289.2129) & adds secs. 6152 & 6153.
Title
Food; service establishments; food allergies; require training and distribution of certain information. Amends sec. 2129 of 2000 PA 92 (MCL 289.2129) & adds secs. 6152 & 6153.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 865 (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 707 (Y: 90 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 566 (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 707 (Y: 90 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 566 (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0516'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/14/2015 @ 3:25 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/10/2015 @ 4:22 Pm |
2014-12-31 | Senate | Presented To Governor 1/2/2015 @ 9:46 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Roll Call # 865 Yeas 33 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-18 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-18 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-12-18 | House | Title Amended |
2014-12-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 707 Yeas 90 Nays 19 |
2014-12-18 | House | Amended |
2014-12-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-12-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-12-16 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2014-12-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-12-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-12-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-09-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce |
2014-09-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-09-24 | House | Received On 09/24/2014 |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 566 Yeas 31 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-3 |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Substitute S-3 Concurred In |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-3 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Judith Emmons |