MI SB0728 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0166'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0166'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil rights: open meetings; open meetings of the independent citizens redistricting commission; require. Amends sec. 8 of 1976 PA 267 (MCL 15.268).
Title
Civil rights: open meetings; open meetings of the independent citizens redistricting commission; require. Amends sec. 8 of 1976 PA 267 (MCL 15.268).
Sponsors
Sen. Ed McBroom [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 620 (Y: 100 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 460 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 460 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-29 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0166'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-12-29 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2021 01:06 Pm |
2021-12-29 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/23/2021 10:54 Am |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/16/2021 03:58 Pm |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2021-12-14 | House | Returned To Senate |
2021-12-14 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2021-12-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 620 Yeas 100 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2021-12-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-12-14 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-12-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-12-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-12-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-12-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-12-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2021-12-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-12-02 | House | Received On 12/02/2021 |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 460 Yeas 34 Nays 0 Excused 4 Not Voting 0 |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ed Mcbroom |