MI SB0727 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0266'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-28 - Assigned Pa 0266'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Individual income tax: home heating credit; funding for weatherization; extend sunset. Amends sec. 527a of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.527a).
Title
Individual income tax: home heating credit; funding for weatherization; extend sunset. Amends sec. 527a of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.527a).
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Zorn [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 54 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0266'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2022 04:28 Pm |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/22/2022 02:42 Pm |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/13/2022 03:17 Pm |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2022-12-07 | House | Returned To Senate |
2022-12-07 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2022-12-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 488 Yeas 93 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 9 |
2022-12-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-12-07 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-12-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-12-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-12-07 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2022-12-07 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2022-12-07 | House | Rule Suspended |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2022-03-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-03-03 | House | Received On 03/03/2022 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 54 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Dale W. Zorn |