MI SB0725 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
Pending: House Local Government And Municipal Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
Pending: House Local Government And Municipal Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; delinquent taxes; delinquent tax foreclosure proceedings; modify certain notices. Amends secs. 78b, 78c & 78f of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.78b et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0726'19
Title
Property tax; delinquent taxes; delinquent tax foreclosure proceedings; modify certain notices. Amends secs. 78b, 78c & 78f of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.78b et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0726'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 100 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance |
2020-03-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-03-11 | House | Received On 03/11/2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 100 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jim Runestad |