MI SB0718 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Assigned Pa 0087'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Assigned Pa 0087'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; traffic regulation; roadside drug testing for controlled substances; allow. Amends sec. 625t of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.625t).
Title
Traffic control; traffic regulation; roadside drug testing for controlled substances; allow. Amends sec. 625t of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.625t).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 211 (Y: 77 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 126 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 126 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0087'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 06/11/2020 10:37 Am |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Approved By Governor 06/11/2020 09:43 Am |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Presented To Governor 06/02/2020 02:00 Pm |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2020-05-27 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-05-27 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-05-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 211 Yeas 77 Nays 30 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-05-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-05-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-05-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-05-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-05-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2020-03-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-03-17 | House | Received On 03/17/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 126 Yeas 28 Nays 9 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Peter Macgregor |
Subjects
Controlled substances: use
Crimes: intoxication or impairment
Traffic control: traffic regulation
Traffic control: violations
Crimes: intoxication or impairment
Traffic control: traffic regulation
Traffic control: violations