MI SB0715 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-10 - Referred To Committee On Communications And Technology
Pending: House Communications And Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-10 - Referred To Committee On Communications And Technology
Pending: House Communications And Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Aeronautics; unmanned aerial systems; local ordinances; allow Mackinac Island to regulate unmanned aerial systems. Amends sec. 5 of 2016 PA 436 (MCL 259.305).
Title
Aeronautics; unmanned aerial systems; local ordinances; allow Mackinac Island to regulate unmanned aerial systems. Amends sec. 5 of 2016 PA 436 (MCL 259.305).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 282 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Communications And Technology |
2018-05-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-05-10 | House | Received On 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 282 Yeas 31 Nays 4 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne Schmidt |