MI SB0706 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-01-27 - Referred To Committee On Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Hearing: May 24 @ 10:30 am in Room 521, House Office Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Transportation: other; definition of automated driving systems and automated vehicle roadway; modify and expand. Amends secs. 2b, 642, 665 & 665a of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.2b et seq.) & adds secs. 665c, 665d & 666a.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation: other; definition of automated driving systems and automated vehicle roadway; modify and expand. Amends secs. 2b, 642, 665 & 665a of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.2b et seq.) & adds secs. 665c, 665d & 666a.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 14 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-27HouseReferred To Committee On Transportation
2022-01-27HouseRead A First Time
2022-01-27HouseReceived On 01/27/2022
2022-01-27SenatePassed Roll Call # 14 Yeas 33 Nays 4 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2022-01-27SenateSubstitute (s-2) Adopted
2022-01-26SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2022-01-26SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2022-01-26SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2021-12-14SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2021-12-14SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2021-12-14SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2021-10-27SenateReferred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development
2021-10-27SenateIntroduced By Senator Ken Horn

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-SB-0706
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2021-SIB-0706.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2021-SEBS-0706.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-SCVBS-0706-00B74.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0706-G.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0706-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0706-BFDA0511.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0706-U.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-12-14-099.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2022-SJ-01-27-007.htm

Bill Comments

feedback