MI SB0706 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0454'16 12/30/16 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0454'16 12/30/16 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; traffic regulation; special permit for certain vehicles transporting forest products; prohibit local units of government from requiring under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 725 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.725).
Title
Traffic control; traffic regulation; special permit for certain vehicles transporting forest products; prohibit local units of government from requiring under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 725 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.725).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 662 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 317 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 317 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0454'16 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/5/2017 @ 11:06 Am 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 1/4/2017 @ 2:14 Pm 12/30/16 Addenda |
2016-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/27/2016 @ 1:54 Pm |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2016-12-13 | House | Returned To Senate |
2016-12-13 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-13 | House | Passed Roll Call # 662 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2016-12-13 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-12-13 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-12-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-12-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-11-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-11-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-05-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2016-05-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-05-24 | House | Received On 05/24/2016 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 317 Yeas 34 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Thomas Casperson |