MI SB0706 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-03 - Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
Pending: House Families, Children, And Seniors Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-03 - Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
Pending: House Families, Children, And Seniors Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; life; use of senior-specific certification and professional designations by insurance producers; prohibit in certain cases. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 2007a.
Title
Insurance; life; use of senior-specific certification and professional designations by insurance producers; prohibit in certain cases. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 2007a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 642 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2011-11-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-11-03 | House | Received On 11/03/2011 |
2011-11-03 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 642 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-11-03 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2011-11-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2011-11-03 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2011-11-03 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-09-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |