MI SB0703 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-31 - Vetoed By Governor 12/28/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Animals; other; importation requirements for large carnivore; implement. Amends 2000 PA 274 (MCL 287.1101 - 287.1123) by adding sec. 8a. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0210'11

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animals; other; importation requirements for large carnivore; implement. Amends 2000 PA 274 (MCL 287.1101 - 287.1123) by adding sec. 8a. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0210'11

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 1030 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 802 (Y: 70 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 566 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-31SenateVetoed By Governor 12/28/2012
2012-12-31SenatePresented To Governor 12/27/2012 @ 1:52 Pm 2012 Addenda
2012-12-13SenateOrdered Enrolled
2012-12-13SenateFull Title Agreed To
2012-12-13SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2012-12-13SenateHouse Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 1030 Yeas 29 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2012-12-13SenateHouse Inserted Full Title
2012-12-13HouseReturned To Senate
2012-12-13HouseInserted Full Title
2012-12-13HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 802 Yeas 70 Nays 40
2012-12-13HouseRead A Third Time
2012-12-12HousePlaced On Third Reading
2012-12-12HouseAmended
2012-12-12HouseRead A Second Time
2012-11-28HouseReferred To Second Reading
2012-11-28HouseReported With Recommendation With Amendment(s)
2011-10-11HouseReferred To Committee On Agriculture
2011-10-11HouseRead A First Time
2011-10-11HouseReceived On 10/11/2011
2011-10-11SenatePassed Roll Call # 566 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2011-10-06SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2011-10-06SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2011-10-06SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2011-10-04SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2011-10-04SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2011-10-04SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2011-09-27SenateReferred To Committee On Agriculture

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2011-SB-0703
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2011-SIB-0703.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2011-SEBS-0703.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2011-SEBH-0703.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2011-SNB-0703.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2011-SJ-10-04-074.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2011-SJ-10-11-077.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-11-28-075.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2012-HJ-12-13-082.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2012-SJ-12-13-080.htm

Bill Comments

feedback