MI SB0700 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0389'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Assigned Pa 0389'20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Juveniles: juvenile justice services; juvenile justice and delinquency prevention act; require to limit the use of secure juvenile detention facilities for status offenders. Amends secs. 1, 15 & 18, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.1 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0893'20, SB 0894'20
Title
Juveniles: juvenile justice services; juvenile justice and delinquency prevention act; require to limit the use of secure juvenile detention facilities for status offenders. Amends secs. 1, 15 & 18, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.1 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0893'20, SB 0894'20
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 583 (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-12-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 560 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 421 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 560 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 421 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0389'20 |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 01/04/2021 01:10 Pm |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Approved By Governor 01/04/2021 10:56 Am |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/22/2020 11:24 Am |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2020-12-18 | Senate | House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 583 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-16 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-12-16 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-12-16 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 560 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-12-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-12-16 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-12-16 | House | Amended |
2020-12-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-12-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-12-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2020-12-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-12-04 | House | Received On 12/04/2020 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 421 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Sylvia Santana |