MI SB0692 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
Pending: House Local Government And Municipal Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Housing; inspection; change of ownership; exclude certain transfers. Amends sec. 125 of 1917 PA 167 (MCL 125.525).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing; inspection; change of ownership; exclude certain transfers. Amends sec. 125 of 1917 PA 167 (MCL 125.525).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26HouseReferred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance
2020-02-26HouseRead A First Time
2020-02-26HouseReceived On 02/26/2020
2020-02-26SenatePassed Roll Call # 82 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-02-25SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2020-02-25SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2020-02-25SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2020-02-18SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2020-02-18SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-02-18SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2019-12-11SenateReferred To Committee On Local Government
2019-12-11SenateIntroduced By Senator Dale W. Zorn

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback