MI SB0691 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 204'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 204'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement; county employees; retirement health benefits under a retirement system established by a county board of commissioners; make subject to the protecting local government retirement and benefits act. Amends secs. 12a, 12d & 12e of 1851 PA 156 (MCL 46.12a et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0686'17
Title
Retirement; county employees; retirement health benefits under a retirement system established by a county board of commissioners; make subject to the protecting local government retirement and benefits act. Amends secs. 12a, 12d & 12e of 1851 PA 156 (MCL 46.12a et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0686'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 465 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 494 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 494 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-28 | Senate | Assigned Pa 204'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/20/2017 @ 2:48 Pm |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Approved By Governor 12/19/2017 @ 7:46 Pm |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Presented To Governor 12/19/2017 @ 9:38 Am |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2017-12-12 | House | Returned To Senate |
2017-12-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 465 Yeas 106 Nays 3 |
2017-12-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-12-12 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-12-12 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-12-12 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-12-12 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2017-12-12 | House | Rule Suspended |
2017-12-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-12-12 | House | Received On 12/07/2017 |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 494 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-12-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Introduced By Senator David Hildenbrand |
Subjects
Counties: boards and commissions
Retirement: county employees
Retirement: defined benefit
Retirement: health benefits
Retirement: county employees
Retirement: defined benefit
Retirement: health benefits