MI SB0690 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Assigned Pa 0123'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations; zero budget; supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Creates appropriation act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations; zero budget; supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2019-2020. Creates appropriation act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 215 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 242 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 145 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-22SenateAssigned Pa 0123'20 With Immediate Effect
2020-07-22SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 07/01/2020 01:40 Pm
2020-07-22SenateApproved By Governor 07/01/2020 10:52 Am
2020-06-24SenatePresented To Governor 06/23/2020 12:17 Pm
2020-06-17SenateAmendment(s) Defeated
2020-06-17SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-17SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2020-06-17SenateRoll Call: Roll Call # 215 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2020-06-17SenateHouse Substitute (h-3) Concurred In
2020-06-17HouseReturned To Senate
2020-06-17HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 242 Yeas 108 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2020-06-17HouseRead A Third Time
2020-06-17HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-06-17HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-06-17HouseSubstitute (h-3) Adopted
2020-06-17HouseSubstitute (h-2) Adopted
2020-06-17HouseRead A Second Time
2020-06-03HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-06-03HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2)
2020-05-19HouseReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2020-05-19HouseRead A First Time
2020-05-19HouseReceived On 05/19/2020
2020-05-13SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 145 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2020-05-13SenateAmendment(s) Adopted
2020-05-13SenateAmendment(s) Defeated
2020-05-13SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2020-05-13SenateRules Suspended
2020-05-13SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) As Amended
2020-05-13SenateSubstitute (s-2) As Amended Concurred In
2020-05-13SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) And Amendment(s)
2020-05-13SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2)
2020-05-13SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-05-13SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
2019-12-11SenateReferred To Committee On Appropriations
2019-12-11SenateIntroduced By Senator Jim Stamas

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-SB-0690
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2019-SIB-0690.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBS-0690.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBH-0690.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2019-SNB-0690.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2020-PA-0123.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-05-13-041.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-06-03-049.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-06-17-055.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-06-17-054.htm

Bill Comments

feedback