MI SB0690 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 12 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-12-12 - Referred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness
Pending: House Michigan Competitiveness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Retirement; municipal employees; revocation of municipality's election to participate in the retirement system; allow, and make act subject to the protecting local government retirement and benefits act. Amends sec. 36 of 1984 PA 427 (MCL 38.1536) & adds sec. 41a. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0686'17

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement; municipal employees; revocation of municipality's election to participate in the retirement system; allow, and make act subject to the protecting local government retirement and benefits act. Amends sec. 36 of 1984 PA 427 (MCL 38.1536) & adds sec. 41a. TIE BAR WITH: SB 0686'17

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 493 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-12HouseReferred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness
2017-12-12HouseRead A First Time
2017-12-12HouseReceived On 12/07/2017
2017-12-07SenatePassed Roll Call # 493 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2017-12-07SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2017-12-07SenateRules Suspended
2017-12-07SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2
2017-12-07SenateSubstitute S-2 Concurred In
2017-12-07SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2
2017-12-06SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2017-12-06SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-12-06SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2017-11-30SenateReferred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness
2017-11-30SenateIntroduced By Senator Jim Stamas

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback