MI SB0686 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 202'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Retirement; other; protecting local government retirement and benefits act; create. Creates new act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement; other; protecting local government retirement and benefits act; create. Creates new act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 518 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 462 (Y: 104 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 490 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-12-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-28SenateAssigned Pa 202'17 With Immediate Effect
2017-12-28SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 12/20/2017 @ 2:44 Pm
2017-12-28SenateApproved By Governor 12/20/2017 @ 2:07 Pm
2017-12-28SenatePresented To Governor 12/19/2017 @ 9:34 Am
2017-12-12SenateOrdered Enrolled
2017-12-12SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2017-12-12Senate Roll Call # 518 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2017-12-12SenateHouse Substitute H-2 Concurred In
2017-12-12HouseReturned To Senate
2017-12-12HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 462 Yeas 104 Nays 5
2017-12-12HouseRead A Third Time
2017-12-12HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2017-12-12HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-12-12HouseSubstitute H-2 Adopted
2017-12-12HouseRead A Second Time
2017-12-12HousePlaced On Second Reading
2017-12-12HouseRule Suspended
2017-12-12HouseRead A First Time
2017-12-12HouseReceived On 12/07/2017
2017-12-07SenatePassed Roll Call # 490 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2017-12-07SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2017-12-07SenateRules Suspended
2017-12-07SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-4
2017-12-07SenateSubstitute S-4 Concurred In
2017-12-07SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-4
2017-12-06SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2017-12-06SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-12-06SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2017-11-30SenateReferred To Committee On Michigan Competitiveness
2017-11-30SenateIntroduced By Senator Jim Stamas

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-SB-0686
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2017-SIB-0686.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBS-0686.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2017-SEBH-0686.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2017-SNB-0686.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2017-PA-0202.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-12-06-099.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-12-07-100.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-12-12-096.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-12-12-101.htm

Bill Comments

feedback