MI SB0683 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-01 - Assigned Pa 0118'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Juveniles: other; court jurisdiction over juveniles; modify. Amends secs. 3 & 5 of chapter of XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.3 & 712A.5).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juveniles: other; court jurisdiction over juveniles; modify. Amends secs. 3 & 5 of chapter of XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.3 & 712A.5).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-03 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 521 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 394 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-01SenateAssigned Pa 0118'21 With Immediate Effect
2021-12-01SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 11/30/2021 02:56 Pm
2021-12-01SenateApproved By Governor 11/30/2021 09:35 Am
2021-11-30SenatePresented To Governor 11/18/2021 09:34 Am
2021-11-10SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-11-10SenateFull Title Agreed To
2021-11-10SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2021-11-04SenateLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2021-11-03HouseReturned To Senate
2021-11-03HouseInserted Full Title
2021-11-03HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 521 Yeas 103 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 6
2021-11-03HouseRead A Third Time
2021-11-02HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-11-02HouseRead A Second Time
2021-10-26HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-10-26HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2021-10-20HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2021-10-20HouseRead A First Time
2021-10-20HouseReceived On 10/20/2021
2021-10-20SenatePassed Roll Call # 394 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2021-10-19SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2021-10-19SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2021-10-19SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2021-10-19SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2021-10-19SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2021-10-07SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2021-10-07SenateIntroduced By Senator Michael D. Macdonald

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-SB-0683
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2021-SIB-0683.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2021-SEBH-0683.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2021-SNB-0683.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/publicact/htm/2021-PA-0118.htm
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0683-G.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0683-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0683-A078D717.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0683-FD7D6426.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-10-19-082.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-10-20-083.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-10-26-088.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-11-03-092.htm

Bill Comments

feedback