MI SB0674 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-12)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 0197'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Civil rights; other; breastfeeding in public places; protect as civil right. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5591'14, HB 5592'14

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil rights; other; breastfeeding in public places; protect as civil right. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 5591'14, HB 5592'14

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: House Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 510 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 426 (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 654 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-16SenateAssigned Pa 0197'14 With Immediate Effect
2014-07-16SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 6/24/2014 @ 4:50 Pm
2014-07-16SenateApproved By Governor 6/24/2014 @ 4:29 Pm
2014-07-16SenatePresented To Governor 6/19/2014 @ 3:28 Pm
2014-06-12SenateOrdered Enrolled
2014-06-12SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2014-06-12SenateHouse Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 510 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2014-06-12HouseReturned To Senate
2014-06-12HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 426 Yeas 108 Nays 2
2014-06-12HouseRead A Third Time
2014-06-11HousePlaced On Third Reading
2014-06-11HouseAmended
2014-06-11HouseRead A Second Time
2014-05-22HouseReferred To Second Reading
2014-05-22HouseReported With Recommendation With Amendment(s)
2013-12-12HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2013-12-12HouseRead A First Time
2013-12-12HouseReceived On 12/12/2013
2013-12-12SenatePassed Roll Call # 654 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2013-12-12SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2013-12-12SenateRules Suspended
2013-12-12SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2013-12-12SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2013-12-11SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2013-12-11SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2013-12-11SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2013-11-14SenateReassigned To Committee On Judiciary
2013-11-12SenateReferred To Committee On Government Operations
2013-11-12SenateIntroduced By Senator Rebekah Warren

Same As/Similar To

HB5077 (Same As) 2013-10-15 - Printed Bill Filed 10/11/2013

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2013-SB-0674
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2013-SIB-0674.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2013-SEBS-0674.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2013-SEBH-0674.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2013-SNB-0674.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/publicact/htm/2014-PA-0197.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2013-SJ-12-11-101.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2013-SJ-12-12-102.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2014-HJ-05-22-049.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2014-HJ-06-12-058.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2014-SJ-06-12-057.htm

Bill Comments

feedback