MI SB0674 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-20 - Assigned Pa 0191'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Income tax; other; apportionment of tax base for a flow-through entity; clarify. Amends sec. 661 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.661).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax; other; apportionment of tax base for a flow-through entity; clarify. Amends sec. 661 of 1967 PA 281 (MCL 206.661).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-10-06 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 400 (Y: 63 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 515 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-10-20SenateAssigned Pa 0191'11 With Immediate Effect
2011-10-20SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 10/18/2011 @ 4:28 Pm
2011-10-20SenateApproved By Governor 10/17/2011 @ 2:46 Pm
2011-10-18SenatePresented To Governor 10/14/2011 @ 1:48 Pm
2011-10-11SenateOrdered Enrolled
2011-10-11SenateFull Title Agreed To
2011-10-11SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2011-10-11SenateHouse Inserted Full Title
2011-10-06HouseReturned To Senate
2011-10-06HouseInserted Full Title
2011-10-06HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 400 Yeas 63 Nays 45
2011-10-06HouseRead A Third Time
2011-10-05HousePlaced On Third Reading
2011-10-05HouseRead A Second Time
2011-10-05HouseReferred To Second Reading
2011-10-05HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2011-09-28HouseReferred To Committee On Tax Policy
2011-09-28HouseRead A First Time
2011-09-28HouseReceived On 09/28/2011
2011-09-28SenatePassed Roll Call # 515 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2011-09-22SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2011-09-22SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2011-09-22SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2011-09-22SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2011-09-22SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2011-09-15SenateReferred To Committee On Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB4963 (Same As) 2011-10-19 - Re-referred To Committee On Tax Policy

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2011-SB-0674
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2011-SIB-0674.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2011-SEBS-0674.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2011-SEBH-0674.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2011-SNB-0674.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/publicact/htm/2011-PA-0191.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2011-SJ-09-22-071.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/Senate/htm/2011-SJ-09-28-073.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2011-HJ-10-05-077.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2011-2012/Journal/House/htm/2011-HJ-10-06-078.htm

Bill Comments

feedback