MI SB0674 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-12-17 - Assigned Pa 0163'09 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Environmental protection; sewage; intermunicipal water and sewer authority; authorize to contract with Indian tribe for payment of system construction costs. Amends sec. 7 of 1955 PA 233 (MCL 124.287).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental protection; sewage; intermunicipal water and sewer authority; authorize to contract with Indian tribe for payment of system construction costs. Amends sec. 7 of 1955 PA 233 (MCL 124.287).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-08-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-12-17 Assigned Pa 0163'09 With Immediate Effect
2009-12-17 Filed With Secretary Of State 12/14/2009 @ 9:58 Am
2009-12-17 Approved By Governor 12/11/2009 @ 4:04 Pm
2009-12-08 Presented To Governor 12/4/2009 @ 1:58 Pm
2009-12-01 Ordered Enrolled
2009-12-01 Given Immediate Effect
2009-11-12 Returned To Senate
2009-11-12 Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 546 Yeas 92 Nays 9
2009-11-12 Read A Third Time
2009-11-12 Placed On Immediate Passage
2009-11-12 Placed On Third Reading
2009-11-12 Read A Second Time
2009-10-21 Referred To Second Reading
2009-10-21 Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment(s)
2009-08-26 Reassign To Committee On Regulatory Reform 08/26/2009
2009-08-19 Referred To Committee On Intergovernmental And Regional Affairs
2009-08-19 Read A First Time
2009-08-19 Received On 08/19/2009
2009-08-19 Passed Roll Call # 398 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2009-08-19 Placed On Immediate Passage
2009-08-19 Rules Suspended
2009-08-19 Placed On Order Of Third Reading
2009-08-19 Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2009-08-18 Referred To Committee Of The Whole
2009-08-18 Committee Recommended Immediate Effect
2009-08-18 Reported Favorably Without Amendment
2009-06-25 Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Regulatory Reform

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback