MI SB0674 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - Assigned Pa 0124'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Transportation: motor fuel tax; rate increase on certain previously-taxed motor fuel; repeal. Repeals sec. 10 of 2000 PA 403 (MCL 207.1010).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation: motor fuel tax; rate increase on certain previously-taxed motor fuel; repeal. Repeals sec. 10 of 2000 PA 403 (MCL 207.1010).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 600 (Y: 98 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 393 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-29SenateAssigned Pa 0124'21 With Immediate Effect
2021-12-29SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 12/17/2021 04:16 Pm
2021-12-29SenateApproved By Governor 12/16/2021 05:25 Pm
2021-12-16SenatePresented To Governor 12/16/2021 03:44 Pm
2021-12-14SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-12-14SenateFull Title Agreed To
2021-12-14SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2021-12-09HouseReturned To Senate
2021-12-09HouseInserted Full Title
2021-12-09HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 600 Yeas 98 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
2021-12-09HouseRead A Third Time
2021-12-07HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-12-07HouseRead A Second Time
2021-11-30HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-11-30HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2021-10-20HouseReferred To Committee On Transportation
2021-10-20HouseRead A First Time
2021-10-20HouseReceived On 10/20/2021
2021-10-20SenatePassed Roll Call # 393 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2021-10-19SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2021-10-19SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2021-10-14SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2021-10-14SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2021-10-14SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2021-10-05SenateReferred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
2021-10-05SenateIntroduced By Senator Aric Nesbitt

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-SB-0674
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2021-SIB-0674.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2021-SEBH-0674.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2021-SNB-0674.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/publicact/htm/2021-PA-0124.htm
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0674-G.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0674-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0674-4240737C.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0674-90734BB1.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0674-843A350D.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0674-BDB7C240.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-0674-BD95BBEE.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-0674-N.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-10-14-081.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-10-20-083.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-11-30-096.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-12-09-101.htm

Bill Comments

feedback