MI SB0672 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Referred To Committee On Financial Services
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Referred To Committee On Financial Services
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Trade: data security; an affirmative defense for covered entities with cybersecurity programs under certain circumstances; provide for. Amends title of 2004 PA 452 (MCL 445.61 - 445.79d) & adds sec. 12c.
Title
Trade: data security; an affirmative defense for covered entities with cybersecurity programs under certain circumstances; provide for. Amends title of 2004 PA 452 (MCL 445.61 - 445.79d) & adds sec. 12c.
Sponsors
Sen. Wayne Schmidt [R] | Sen. Adam Hollier [D] | Sen. Kenneth Horn [R] | Sen. Marshall Bullock [D] |
Rep. Curtis VanderWall [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 65 (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2022-03-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-03-09 | House | Received On 03/09/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 65 Yeas 20 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Energy And Technology |
2021-10-05 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Wayne A. Schmidt |